DACORUM SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1103980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.10m £8.41m £9.63m £2.30m £2.33m
Total expenditure £8.64m £8.55m £9.91m £2.82m £2.51m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £592.89k £264.35k £408.93k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £444.00k £444.00k £444.00k £29.00k £29.52k
Income - Other trading activities £1.30m £1.27m £1.17m £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.36m £6.69m £7.03m £1.85m £1.93m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.37k £190 £65 £362 £390
Income - Other £0 £0 £993.50k £422.62k £374.47k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.90m £7.74m £8.39m £2.36m £2.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £736.84k £807.15k £859.94k £464.37k £461.39k
Expenditure - Governance £54.15k £53.80k £58.77k £11.50k £12.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £657.44k £0 £0