BILLINGLEY VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1104405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.89k £16.76k £12.21k £15.56k £14.63k
Total expenditure £15.71k £15.77k £8.58k £10.39k £12.66k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A