SOLACE SURVIVING EXILE AND PERSECUTION

Charity number: 1104507
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £211.47k £240.57k £264.66k £411.18k £581.05k
Total expenditure £233.96k £241.18k £243.12k £392.59k £554.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £21.96k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £134.71k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.97k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £566.08k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £554.91k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0