ZICHRON MEIR LIMITED

Charity number: 1104523
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £1.51m £1.68m £5.39m £5.75m £813.34k
Total expenditure £500.81k £429.60k £317.62k £551.84k £768.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.36m £1.54m £5.17m £5.20m £20.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £149.53k £143.14k £216.26k £550.65k £793.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £367.77k £424.51k £310.46k £444.76k £685.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds £133.05k £5.09k £7.16k £57.34k £82.97k
Expenditure - Governance £2.37k £3.91k £11.94k £10.42k £10.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £365.30k £416.50k £297.12k £428.96k £675.20k
Expenditure - Investment management £133.05k £5.09k £7.16k £57.34k £82.97k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £49.74k £0