Financial history LITTLE SWANS (NORFOLK)

Charity number: 1104647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £69.79k £92.50k £89.09k £72.87k £87.18k
Total expenditure £74.25k £83.75k £99.04k £81.68k £76.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £55.72k £83.75k £76.34k £60.09k £74.46k