CLAPHAM PARK PROJECT

Charity number: 1135137
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £245.00k £281.28k £263.00k £258.03k £204.67k
Total expenditure £315.40k £296.92k £259.00k £353.89k £294.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £90.43k N/A £26.00k £33.46k
Income from government grants £30.00k £1.37k £163.00k £26.00k N/A