Financial history Alex, The Leukodystrophy Charity

Charity number: 1106008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £571.43k £686.99k £634.70k £776.43k £731.98k
Total expenditure £594.62k £687.06k £638.72k £597.50k £707.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £32.00k N/A N/A £160.91k £147.24k
Income - Donations and legacies £104.13k £198.30k £96.61k £214.34k £249.72k
Income - Other trading activities £467.26k £488.68k £537.99k £560.08k £482.24k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £40 £8 £108 £134 £23
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.87k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £140.67k £198.93k £132.11k £123.36k £191.94k
Expenditure - Raising funds £453.95k £488.13k £506.61k £474.14k £515.16k
Expenditure - Governance £4.02k £3.49k £3.42k £3.43k £3.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £5.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0