Accounts and annual returns OSMANI NAGOR WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1106799
Charity reporting is overdue by 1631 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 170 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 170 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 535 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 535 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 900 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 900 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1265 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1265 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1631 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1631 days