Financial history OSMANI NAGOR WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1106799
Charity reporting is overdue by 1637 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £0 £0 £249 £450 £920
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £100 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A