Trustees THE ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA ARCHERY SOCIETY
Charity number: 1107064

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Wilson | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Forryan | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Mallinson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Iredale | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nick Green | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Damien Culley | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Georgiou | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Mallinson | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN CHARLES TUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.