COMMUNITY ACTION FOR INTEGRATION

Charity number: 1107202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.85k £8.50k £9.50k £8.76k £9.92k
Total expenditure £9.72k £8.49k £9.49k £8.74k £9.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A