Governing document ARK SCHOOLS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 12 MAY 2004, 14 SEPTEMBER 2005 ,3 AUGUST 2006 AND AMENDED 1 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON, MANAGING AND DEVELOPING SCHOOLS ("THE ACADEMIES") OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM WITH A STRONG EMPHASIS ON, BUT IN NO WAY LIMITED TO ONE OR A COMBINATION OF THE SPECIALISMS SPECIFIED IN THE FUNDING ARRANGEMENTS ENTERED INTO BETWEEN THE TRUST AND THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR EDUCATION AND SKILLS ("SECRETARY OF STATE").
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.