BRIAN MURTAGH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1105099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 13 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 23 December 2019 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 23 December 2019 23 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 29 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 29 December 2016 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 29 December 2016 29 days late Download