Linked charities DEAF DIRECT
Charity number: 1105044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 21 OCT 1957
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 FEB 2018
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE DEAF, PARTIALLY DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING OF THE CITY OF OXFORD AND ITS DIOCESE.
Area of benefit
THE CITY AND DIOCESE OF OXFORD
Registration history
- 27 March 1962 : Standard registration
- 12 February 2009 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.