Financial history IN HIM LIFE CHURCH

Charity number: 1106760
Charity reporting is overdue by 136 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.15k £5.33k £13.50k £15.00k £15.00k
Total expenditure £4.18k £4.66k £12.25k £12.50k £9.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k £10.00k N/A