INTEGRATION AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1106014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 June 2020 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 February 2018 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 February 2017 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required