INTEGRATION AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1106014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £85 £250 £150 £10 £0
Total expenditure £80 £240 £149 £10 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A