Financial history YAD VEACHISOMOCH L'CHAIM

Charity number: 1105231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £349.98k £459.54k £659.86k £412.87k £660.26k
Total expenditure £356.68k £419.24k £553.76k £449.31k £503.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £30.59k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £659.68k N/A £641.23k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £173 N/A £15
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £19.01k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £553.76k N/A £503.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.40k N/A £2.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £469.02k N/A £19.48k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0