Financial history CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY TRUST FOR NORWICH AND NORFOLK LIMITED

Charity number: 1105340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £62.91k £44.22k £92.20k £159.53k £82.52k
Total expenditure £60.08k £42.62k £82.48k £163.62k £79.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A