Accounts and annual returns AGE UK MERTON

Charity number: 1105384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window