Accounts and annual returns ROCK OF SALVATION CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1105548
Charity reporting is overdue by 1704 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 243 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 243 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 608 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 608 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 973 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 973 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1339 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1339 days
Annual return 31 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1704 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1704 days