THE SURAT SUNNI VOHRA WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1106562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £5.23k £4.91k £5.23k £4.98k £11.33k
Total expenditure £5.03k £5.23k £5.23k £5.23k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A