Accounts and annual returns INET TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1105670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 11 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 11 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 25 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 19 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 17 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 07 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 07 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window