Accounts and annual returns EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL ANTHROPOLOGISTS

Charity number: 1108186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window