Financial history EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL ANTHROPOLOGISTS

Charity number: 1108186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £321.54k £91.78k £397.45k £98.42k £276.15k
Total expenditure £251.14k £82.19k £321.46k £112.25k £234.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A