THE ROWNTREE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1105936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 29 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 28 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download