THE ROWNTREE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1105936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.58k £106.17k £63.35k £158.99k £6.82k
Total expenditure £49.37k £43.78k £49.72k £48.46k £43.24k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A