ACTION FOR SILVERDALE CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1106108
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3066 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3066 days
Annual return 31 March 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3432 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3432 days
Annual return 31 March 2010 16 March 2011 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 30 March 2010 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 07 July 2009 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required