Accounts and annual returns THE FABKON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1106406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required