THE DOROTHY HELEN HABBEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1108185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 February 2021 24 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2020 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2019 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2018 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2017 09 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2017 Not Required