BOYNTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1106205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.40k £5.00k £4.92k £4.92k £13.06k
Total expenditure £7.76k £3.52k £4.41k £4.41k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k