THE BURTON JOYCE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1106485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.71k £9.31k £8.01k £9.34k £4.76k
Total expenditure £13.78k £9.18k £8.87k £8.00k £4.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A