THE FRIENDS OF TOWER HAMLETS CEMETERY PARK

Charity number: 1107136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download