Financial history GOSPEL FOR TRIBALS SOCIAL SERVICE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1107428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £518.73k £377.39k £260.65k £495.54k £359.77k
Total expenditure £522.40k £326.11k £314.17k £487.96k £292.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £494.36k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £24.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £522.40k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A