INSTITUTE OF IMAGINATION

Charity number: 1109276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £362.16k £641.72k £1.64m £632.08k £741.52k
Total expenditure £989.86k £1.31m £1.34m £1.31m £888.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £61.83k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £19.95k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £577.31k £1.57m £483.17k £664.16k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £10.46k £10.01k £144.81k £56.70k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £53.95k £55.60k £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £2.59k £4.09k £707
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £19.95k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £821.53k £1.00m £946.26k £698.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £492.61k £341.00k £361.98k £189.46k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £34.07k £61.71k £66.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0