RINGWOOD CARERS' GROUP IN CONJUNCTION WITH CHURCHES TOGETHER

Charity number: 1107545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 11 April 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required