Financial history HILLTOP PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1106476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £97.07k £18.37k £20.95k £10.69k £5.90k
Total expenditure £38.79k £52.12k £23.26k £5.39k £32.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A