Trustees BASSETLAW ACTION CENTRE

Charity number: 1106908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Denise Mary Colton Chair 21 October 2013
None on record
Stacey Jade Reed Trustee 12 September 2023
None on record
Helen Julia Derby Trustee 13 June 2022
None on record
SIMON JOHN FRANCIS LAMB Trustee 24 March 2022
SHEFFIELD CHURCHES' COUNCIL FOR COMMUNITY CARE
Received: On time
Janet Elizabeth Coyne Trustee 25 February 2019
None on record
Anthony Tromans Trustee 28 October 2011
KING EDWARD VI GRAMMAR SCHOOL TRUST
Overdue by 754 days
THE HOSPICE OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD
Received: On time
THE CHRISTOPHER RICHARD JAMES TROMANS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MICHAEL STOREY Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ORDSALL AND RETFORD ST MICHAELS
BRIGADIER MICHAEL EDWARD BROWNE CBE Trustee
None on record
JULIE CALEY Trustee
None on record