FRIENDS OF DELAWARE

Charity number: 1107057
Charity reporting is overdue by 397 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 30/09/2015 31/10/2016 07/11/2017 31/10/2018
Total gross income £5.39k £6.09k £2.58k £1.81k £1.47k
Total expenditure £4.80k £8.19k £2.43k £1.18k £1.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A