Governing document THE ASSOCIATION OF GOVERNING BODIES OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/08/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/02/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/04/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/03/2013 as amended on 17 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.