Accounts and annual returns CLWB FFERMWYR IFANC LLYSYFRAN YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB
Charity number: 1106995
Charity reporting is overdue by 705 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 340 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 340 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 705 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 705 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 August 2020 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 12 February 2020 | 288 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 20 August 2019 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window