Financial history CONSUMERS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1122155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.15m £2.96m £2.71m £2.46m £1.74m
Total expenditure £3.08m £2.26m £2.68m £2.70m £1.73m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £129.96k £604.12k £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.07m £2.84m £2.58m £1.80m £1.58m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £516 £201 £117 £0 £0
Income - Other £82.98k £117.73k £0 £60.82k £153.72k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.94m £2.14m £2.55m £2.51m £1.59m
Expenditure - Raising funds £133.29k £122.89k £128.29k £190.65k £139.07k
Expenditure - Governance £104.35k £44.22k £115.92k £62.89k £23.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £43.98k £95.50k £0 £0 £135.48k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0