Trustees CONSUMERS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1122155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fung Han Wong Trustee 02 May 2019
None on record
Rosemary Siyachitma Trustee 11 November 2016
None on record
Ivo Frans Mechels Trustee 10 February 2016
None on record
Marta Tellado Trustee 21 November 2015
None on record
Anja Philip Trustee 31 October 2013
None on record
Alan Kirkland Trustee 31 October 2013
None on record
MARIMUTHU NADASON Trustee
None on record