NORTH CHESHIRE WIND ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1110947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 11 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required