Linked charities DORKING SOCIETY
Charity number: 1107459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 FEBRUARY 1967 AS AMENDED 21 APRIL 1980, 26 APRIL 1988 AND 16 OCTOBER 1997 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 25 JANUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
A) TO ENCOURAGE THE HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING IN DORKING AND DISTRICT.
B) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE AREA OF DORKING AND DISTRICT.
C) TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
DORKING AND DISTRICT
Registration history
- 02 July 2007 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.