Dogfen lywodraethu Sense Ability Matters LTD.
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 16 AUGUST 2004 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED ON 28 JAN 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUN 2021 as amended on 17 Apr 2023 as amended on 14 May 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Objects of the Charity shall be to relieve Blind and Partially Sighted people, Deaf and Hard of Hearing people and those with any disability or long-term condition in Gateshead and South Tyneside in particular, but not exclusively, by: 1. The provision and maintenance of a comprehensive and co-ordinated service for such persons; and 2. The advancement of the education of the public by the provision of such a service.
Maes buddion
GATESHEAD AND SOUTH TYNESIDE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.