Financial history WELL WOMEN CENTRE

Charity number: 1107523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £456.90k £625.67k £630.17k £607.06k £612.17k
Total expenditure £494.99k £577.10k £555.31k £608.52k £590.79k
Income from government contracts £293.10k N/A N/A N/A £80.16k
Income from government grants £0 £69.41k £69.41k £98.82k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £3.71k £24.76k £34.45k £630
Income - Other trading activities N/A £1.39k £73.35k £111.02k £97.87k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £574.01k £530.12k £459.05k £512.88k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £1.43k £0 £0 £789
Income - Other N/A £45.13k £1.95k £2.54k £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £21.83k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £576.89k £488.05k £606.91k £578.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £216 £216 £1.61k £12.14k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £54.19k £11.63k £0 £1.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £67.04k £0 £0