THE LANKELLYCHASE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1107583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 July 2016 On time Download