Financial history THE LANKELLYCHASE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1107583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.76m £3.81m £3.98m £2.70m £2.42m
Total expenditure £6.62m £5.98m £8.67m £11.32m £14.08m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £18.39k £0 £90.91k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.74m £3.81m £3.89m £2.70m £2.42m
Income - Other -£2.08k £0 £201 £87 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.68m £4.99m £7.69m £10.47m £13.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £932.17k £986.53k £983.41k £849.23k £780.69k
Expenditure - Governance £73.30k £0 £1.33m £31.51k £44.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.47m £0 £6.36m £8.41m £11.04m
Expenditure - Investment management £932.17k £986.53k £983.41k £849.23k £780.69k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0