THE STEVEN JAMES PRACTICE

Charity number: 1108220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 09 September 2016 On time Download